KY SB66 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 235.310 to only allow boating enforcement officers to enter upon boats on the waters of the Commonwealth if the officer has a reasonable and articulable suspicion that a violation of KRS Chapter 235 or the administrative regulations promulgated thereunder has occurred; allow the department to conduct periodic inspections of marine sanitation devices according to regular inspection schedules; name the Act the Boater Freedom Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to boating law enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Girdler [R] | Sen. Walter Blevins [D] | Sen. Jared Carpenter [R] | Sen. Perry Clark [D] |
Sen. Sara Gregory [R] | Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Johnny Turner [D] | Sen. Robin Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 109) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-31 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4) for Monday, March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 80-13 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4) |
2014-03-25 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-24 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-20 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed |
2014-03-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-19 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-24 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-02-21 | House | received in House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-15 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |