KY SB5 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 005)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 005)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to prohibit an abortion when the probable post-fertilization age of the unborn child is 20 weeks or greater; create an affirmative defense if the probable post-fertilization age was less than 20 weeks or if a medical emergency; require a determination of the unborn child's probable post-fertilization age prior to performing an abortion; allow for civil relief; create the Kentucky pain-capable unborn child protection litigation fund; allow for severability; amend KRS 311.595 to allow the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure to suspend or revoke the license of any physician for violations; amend KRS 311.990 to establish a criminal penalty for violations; amend KRS 213.101 to expand the statistical reporting system for abortions; amend KRS 413.140 to provide a one-year statute of limitation for civil actions arising from violations; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to abortion and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 005) |
2017-01-07 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-01-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-01-07 | House | received in House |
2017-01-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-01-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-01-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-15 |
2017-01-07 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3-title) filed |
2017-01-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 7, 2017 |
2017-01-07 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-01-06 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-01-06 | House | 2nd reading |
2017-01-06 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | posting waived |
2017-01-05 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | 1st reading |
2017-01-05 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | received in House |
2017-01-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-6 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 5, 2017 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-01-04 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-01-04 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-01-03 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |