KY SB49 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 21A to require the Supreme Court to analyze and propose adjustments to the Commonwealth's judicial circuits and districts and the judicial assignments therein to account for population changes and caseloads in the same years as legislative redistricting is required.
Title
AN ACT relating to judicial redistricting.
Sponsors
Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Tom Buford [R] | Sen. Carroll Gibson [R] | Sen. Ernie Harris [R] |
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Christian McDaniel [R] | Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] |
Sen. Damon Thayer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | received in House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-1-1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 19, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB49.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB49/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB49/vote_history.pdf |