KY SB48 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Require the recovery of $15,000,000 appropriated to the Cabinet for Economic Development in 2017 Ky. Acts ch. 176, secs. 1 and 3.
Title
AN ACT relating to recovery of prior appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 2052 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | received in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | passed 35-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | floor amendment (2) withdrawn |
2022-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2022 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-12 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2022-01-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-10 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |