KY SB48 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.870 to define "public officer"; amend KRS 61.878 to exempt records that would reveal the address or location of a public officer under certain conditions.
Title
AN ACT relating to personal information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1828 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 439 (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 438 (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1630 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 439 (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 438 (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1630 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Bill passed 32-6 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendment (3) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (3) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 67-24 with floor amendment (3) |
2021-03-29 | House | floor amendment (3) filed |
2021-03-16 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2021-03-15 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2021-03-12 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-12 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-11 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | received in House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-01-13 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Disasters
Emergency Medical Services
Judges and Court Commissioners
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Public Records and Reports
Public Safety
Safety
State Agencies
State Employees
Disasters
Emergency Medical Services
Judges and Court Commissioners
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Public Records and Reports
Public Safety
Safety
State Agencies
State Employees