KY SB48 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 36)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 402.020 to establish a new minimum age for marriage; amend KRS 402.030 to establish the power of courts to declare a marriage void when one party is under 18 years of age; amend KRS 402.210 to prohibit individuals under the age of 17 years from marrying; establish the process for a 17- year old to petition a court for permission to marry and the criteria for granting the petition; repeal KRS 402.260 which provides for the estate of minors who marry to be placed in receivership until they reach the age of 18 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to child marriage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 341 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 514 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 514 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 36)
2018-03-19Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-16House3rd reading, passed 87-0
2018-03-16Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-16Housetaken from Rules
2018-03-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-12Houseposted in committee
2018-03-12Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-03-08Housereceived in House
2018-03-07Senate3rd reading, passed 34-3 with Committee Substitute (1) & floor amendment (1)
2018-03-06Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-06Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2018
2018-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-05Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2018-03-05Senate1st reading
2018-03-05Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2018-01-03Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback