KY SB48 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-17 - to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 183 to allow airport boards to establish an entity to develop airport facilities and operate certain services.
Title
AN ACT relating to public airports.
Sponsors
Sen. Perry Clark [D] | Sen. Alice Kerr [R] | Sen. R.J. Palmer [D] | Sen. John Schickel [R] |
Sen. Dan Seum [R] | Sen. Robert Stivers [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Jack Westwood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | to Transportation (H) | |
2011-02-16 | received in House | |
2011-02-15 | passed 31-7 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (2) (3) (4) and (5) | |
2011-02-15 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading | |
2011-02-14 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-11 | floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-11 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-10 | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-10 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2011 | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-01 | returned to Transportation (S) | |
2011-02-01 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-01 | taken from Transportation (S) | |
2011-01-06 | to Transportation (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB48.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB48/bill.doc |