KY SB4 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Propose to amend Section 95 of the Constitution of Kentucky to hold the election of the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Treasurer, Auditor of Public Accounts, Attorney General, Secretary of State and Commissioner of Agriculture, Labor and Statistics in even-numbered years, every four years, beginning in 2024; provide transitional calendar; submit to the voters for ratification or rejection. Provide ballot language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing to amend Section 95 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to the election of state officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 375 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-03-08Houseposted in committee
2018-01-18Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2018-01-16Housereceived in House
2018-01-11Senate3rd reading, passed 24-11
2018-01-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 11, 2018
2018-01-10Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2018-01-09Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-09Senate2nd reading
2018-01-09Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-08Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-08Senate1st reading
2018-01-08Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-03Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback