KY SB4 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 22)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Establish KRS Chapter 216C; create within that chapter various new sections establishing a medical review panel system for use in civil litigation relating to health care providers, including sections setting out definitions, delineating covered health care facilities and providers, panel membership and formation, functions and deliberations of the panel, and utilization of panel results in civil actions; allow for the electronic filing of proposed complaints if the Cabinet for Health and Family Services establishes an electronic filing system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to medical review panels.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 22)
2017-03-06Senatedelivered to Governor
2017-03-06Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-06Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-03SenateBill passed 25-11
2017-03-03SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute
2017-03-02Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute on Friday, March 2, 2017
2017-03-02Senateto Rules (S)
2017-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-01House3rd reading, passed 51-45 with Committee Substitute
2017-03-01Housefloor amendment (12) (13) (14) (15) (16) (17) (18) (19) (20) and (21) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-03-01Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 1, 2017
2017-03-01Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2017-02-28Housefloor amendment (11) filed
2017-02-27Houseposted in committee
2017-02-23Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2017-02-23House2nd reading
2017-02-23Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2017-01-06Housefloor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) (7-title) (8) (9) and (10) filed
2017-01-05Houseposting waived
2017-01-05Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2017-01-05House1st reading
2017-01-05Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2017-01-05Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2017-01-05Housereceived in House
2017-01-05Senatefloor amendments (11) (12) (13) (14) (15) (16) (17) (18) and (19) ruled out of order
2017-01-05Senatefloor amendments (11) (12) (13) (14) (15) (16)) (17) (18) and (19) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-01-05Senatepassed 23-13 with Committee Substitute (1)
2017-01-05Senatefloor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5-title) (6) (7) (8) (9) and (10) ruled out of order
2017-01-05Senate3rd reading
2017-01-05Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 5, 2017
2017-01-05Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2017-01-04Senatefloor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5-title) (6) (7) (8) (9) and (10) filed
2017-01-04Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2017-01-04Senate2nd reading
2017-01-04Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2017-01-03Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2017-01-03Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senate1st reading
2017-01-03Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB4.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA6.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA7.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA8.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA9.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA10.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA11.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA12.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA13.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA14.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA15.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA16.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA17.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA18.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/SFA19.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA6.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA7.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA8.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA9.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA10.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA11.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA12.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA13.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA14.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA15.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA16.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA17.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA18.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA19.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA20.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB4/HFA21.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB4/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB4/LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB4/SCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB4/HCS1LM.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback