KY SB38 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 344.030 to include within the definition of "reasonable accommodation," accommodations made for pregnancy, childbirth, and related medical conditions; define "related medical condition"; amend KRS 344.040 to make it unlawful for an employer to fail to accommodate an employee affected by pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical condition; require employers to provide notice to all employees regarding the right to be free from discrimination for pregnancy, childbirth, and related medical conditions.
Title
AN ACT relating to pregnancy-related discrimination.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] |
Sen. Wil Schroder [R] | Sen. Reginald Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB38.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB38/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/18RS/SB38/LM.pdf |