KY SB36 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 195)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 635.020 to remove automatic transfer of a child from District Court to Circuit Court in certain cases; amend KRS 640.010 to specify additional factors to be considered in determining whether a child's case should be transferred from District Court to Circuit Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1857 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 450 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1543 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07Senatesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 195)
2021-03-30Senatedelivered to Governor
2021-03-30Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-30Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-30SenateBill passed 36-0
2021-03-30SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-30Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-30Senateto Rules (S)
2021-03-30Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-30House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-30Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2021-03-30Housetaken from Rules
2021-03-30Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-15Houseposted in committee
2021-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-03-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-03-01Houseposted in committee
2021-03-01Houseto Judiciary (H)
2021-02-22Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-22Housereceived in House
2021-02-11Senate3rd reading, passed 26-3
2021-02-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021
2021-02-09Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-04Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-01-11Senateto Judiciary (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback