KY SB34 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend various sections in KRS Chapter 189A, relating to driving under the influence, to expand the look-back window for prior offenses from five years to ten years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to driving under the influence and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2015-03-23Housetaken from Rules
2015-03-04Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2015-03-02Houseposted in committee
2015-03-02Houseposting waived
2015-03-02Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2015-03-02House1st reading
2015-03-02Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2015-02-23Houseto Judiciary (H)
2015-02-12Housereceived in House
2015-02-12Senate3rd reading, passed 32-0 with Committee Substitute
2015-02-12Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015
2015-02-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2015-02-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2015-02-03Senateto Judiciary (S)
2015-01-06Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback