KY SB3 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Propose to amend the Constitution of Kentucky to create a crime victims' bill of rights; submit to voters.
Title
AN ACT proposing to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to crime victims' rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 51 (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 372 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 372 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 372 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 372 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 1) |
2018-01-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-01-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-01-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-3 |
2018-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 24, 2018 |
2018-01-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-17 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-16 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2018-01-10 | House | received in House |
2018-01-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 10, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-01-08 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |