KY SB295 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 214 to prohibit a requirement for any individual to receive a COVID-19 vaccine, modified ribonucleic acid (modRNA) vaccine, or messenger ribonucleic acid (mRNA) vaccine for the purposes of student enrollment, employment, or medical treatment in the Commonwealth.
Title
AN ACT relating to vaccines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3047 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | received in House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 25-11 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Diseases
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Health and Medical Services
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Public Health
Science and Technology
Workforce
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Higher
Health and Medical Services
Labor and Industry
Personnel and Employment
Public Health
Science and Technology
Workforce