KY SB265 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 30)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 30)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Governor to replace the Kentucky State University board of regents by April 1, 2022; direct the Governor's Postsecondary Education Nominating Committee to submit 16 nominations to the Governor by March 26, 2022; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky State University board of regents and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2145 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 274 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2102 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 274 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2102 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 30) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-17 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-17 | Senate | passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | received in House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 08, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |