KY SB244 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 118.225 to require that the ballot position for all statewide office candidates or slates of candidates be determined by lot for each congressional district.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2950 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | received in House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-23 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |