KY SB242 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 116)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 116)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 321.200 to allow a retailer or its agent to offer recommendations, consistent with the label, for over-the-counter animal health products it sells.
Title
AN ACT relating to the retail sale of products used to treat animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 116) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-29 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitutes (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-13 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-22 | House | posting waived |
2016-03-16 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | received in House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-4 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | introduced in Senate |