KY SB24 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - posted in committee
Pending: House Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - posted in committee
Pending: House Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 241.010 to include not-for-profit or non-profit facilities listed on the national register of historic places in the definition of a qualified historic site.
Title
AN ACT relating to qualified historic sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-25 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2013-02-22 | House | received in House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 29-8 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-01-10 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |