KY SB236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
Pending: House Natural Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
Pending: House Natural Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 2.255 to require the Energy and Environment Cabinet to create a website and mobile app for anonymous reporting of litterers and authorize the cabinet to send warning letters; amend KRS 431.100 to direct all fines collected for littering to the charging agency; amend KRS 433.753 to include points for littering drivers; amend KRS 433.753 to include Trooper R Class officers and officers of the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources.
Title
AN ACT relating to littering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 903 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | received in House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Boats and Boating
Driver Licensing
Fish and Wildlife
Forests and Forestry
Hunting and Fishing
Pollution
Tourism
Transportation
Waterways and Dams
Driver Licensing
Fish and Wildlife
Forests and Forestry
Hunting and Fishing
Pollution
Tourism
Transportation
Waterways and Dams