KY SB236 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 115)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 115)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 199 to permit a parent or legal guardian to request a background check of the child abuse and neglect registry records when employing a child care provider for his or her minor child; require the cabinet to make the request form available on its Web site; create language to require the signature of the individual child care provider consenting to a background check; amend KRS 160.380 to require that school superintendents conduct a background check of child abuse and neglect records maintained by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services when considering employment decisions; create new sections of KRS Chapter 211 to define terms, prohibit youth camps from employing or allowing the involvement of any individual who has been convicted of a criminal offense against a minor or a sex crime, who is a violent offender or has abused or neglected a child; require youth camps to obtain state and national criminal background checks of applicants, contractors, or volunteers; require documentation of records checks; provide for suspension of operating permits if a youth camp is not in compliance; establish a criminal penalty for knowingly employing certain offenders; amend KRS 160.157 to allow a private, parochial, or church school to conduct a background check of child abuse and neglect records maintained by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services when considering employment decisions; Section 1 to 2 of this Act are effective July 1, 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to the protection of children.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Sen. George Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 115) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2017-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2017-03-08 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-08 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | 2nd reading |
2017-03-08 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st reading |
2017-03-07 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-03-06 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-03-03 | House | received in House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-28 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |