KY SB229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.747 to replace the member serving on the Blockchain Technology Working Group representing the Kentucky Municipal Utilities Association with a member representing municipal utilities and designated by the Kentucky League of Cities; amend KRS 96.530 to increase from $2,400 to $4,800 the maximum annual pay of a member of municipal utility commission in a city of the home rule class or an urban-county government; amend KRS 96.750 to increase from $2,400 to $4,800 the maximum annual pay of a member of municipal utility commission in a city contracting with the Tennessee Valley Authority (TVA) for the provision of electric utility service; amend KRS 96.780 to increase the maximum amount from $20,000 to $40,000 that a superintendent employed by an electric plant board contracting with the TVA may spend on behalf of the board without board approval; amend KRS 224A.030 to replace the member serving on the Kentucky Infrastructure Authority board representing the Kentucky Municipal Utilities Association with a member representing a municipal utility that provides water and wastewater services and is designated by the Kentucky League of Cities.
Title
AN ACT relating to municipal utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 345 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2947 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2947 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2024-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-12 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | received in House |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 01, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Cities
Cities, Home Rule Class
Information Technology
Public Officers and Employees
Public Utilities
Sewer Systems
Water Supply
Cities
Cities, Home Rule Class
Information Technology
Public Officers and Employees
Public Utilities
Sewer Systems
Water Supply