KY SB226 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 78.510 to 78.852 to provide that the administration of the County Employees Retirement System (CERS) shall be transferred from the Kentucky Retirement System (KRS) board of trustees to the CERS board of trustees established on July 1, 2017; allow the new CERS board to contract with KRS for administration of benefits, investments, or other services as needed for a period not to exceed four years; create new sections of KRS 78.510 to 78.852 and amend KRS 78.510, 78.530, 78.535, 78.540, 78.610, 78.615, 78.616, 78.625, 78.630, 78.640, 78.650, 78.652, 78,790, 78.852, and 78.550 to establish separate statutory provisions governing administration, benefits, and investments of the County Employees Retirement System; establish a 9 member CERS board comprised of 3 elected members, and 6 individuals appointed by the Kentucky League of Cities, the Kentucky Association of Counties, or the Kentucky School Boards Association who must have 10 years of "investment experience" or "retirement experience" as defined by the bill; specify investment, reporting, and transparency requirements; amend KRS 6.350, 16.505, 16.555, 16.576, 16.577, 16.583, 16.582, 18A.205, 61.510, 61.522, 61.535, 61.540, 61.545, 61.550, 61.552, 61.5525, 61.555, 61.559, 61.565, 61.590, 61.592, 61.595, 61.597, 61.598, 61.600, 61.607, 61.621, 61.623, 61.625, 61.630, 61.637, 61.650, 61.652, 61.660, 61.665, 61.670, 61.675, 61.680, 61.690, 61.691, 61.701, 61.702, 61.705, 70.292, 70.293, 95.022, 95.290, 161.155, 161.675, to conform; amend KRS 61.645 to remove CERS elected and appointed representation on the KRS board; amend KRS 7A.250 to place CERS under the jurisdiction of the Public Pension Oversight Board; amend KRS 18A.225 to allow CERS retirees to participate in the Kentucky Employees Health Plan; repeal KRS 78.533, 78.534, 78.532, 78.542, 78.545, 212.434; provide that decisions made by the KRS board on behalf of CERS shall stand and shall not be reversed except as provided by KRS 78.510 to 78.852; provide that the three elected CERS trustees serving on the KRS board prior to July 1, 2017, shall serve as the elected trustees on the new CERS board; provide that no provision of this Act shall increase or decrease benefits to members or retired members of KRS or CERS; confirm Executive Order 2016-340 regarding KRS board expansion; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2017.
Title
AN ACT relating to retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB226.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB226/bill.pdf |