KY SB22 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 21.540, 61.645, and 161.430 to require the Judicial Retirement Plan, the Legislators' Retirement Plan, the Kentucky Retirement Systems, and the Kentucky Teachers' Retirement System to establish by reference in administrative regulation a placement agent disclosure policy; require the policy to disclose, at a minimum, to the boards of trustees of the plans and systems the name of the placement agent, dollar value of investment, and the fees or payments made to placement agent for each investment in which a placement agent was utilized; define placement agent; require the plans and systems to submit a quarterly update of the information disclosed to the respective boards of trustees to the Government Contract Review Committee; provide that the disclosure shall apply to contracts established or renewed on or after July 1, 2015.
Title
AN ACT relating to public pension fund investments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-03-04 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-02 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-02 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2015-02-27 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-23 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | received in House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 11, 2015 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2015-11-12 | Senate | To: Interim Joint Committee on State Government |