KY SB218 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 45)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 45)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 256.080 and 256.090 to make gender-neutral changes.
Title
AN ACT relating to agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 45) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-3 |
2017-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-01 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | received in House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with committee amendments (1) (2-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (1) (2-title) Committee Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | returned to Agriculture (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | taken from Agriculture (S) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | returned to Agriculture (S) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | taken from Agriculture (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |