KY SB214 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the definitions in KRS 278.465 to require that net metering customers use a single meter on their premises, that the customers use the electricity generated for all or part of their electricity requirements, and to increase the allowable size of eligible electric generating facilities from 30 kilowatts to 1000 kilowatts; amend KRS 278.466 to only apply to eligible customer-generators taking net metering service on July 15, 2017, to allow retail electric suppliers to recover all costs necessary to serve all eligible customer-generators taking service after July 15, 2017, and to provide that excess electricity credits are not transferable between meters.
Title
AN ACT relating to net metering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB214.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB214/bill.pdf |