KY SB211 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 45)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 45)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate February 21 of each year as "ALS Awareness Day" throughout the Commonwealth.
Title
AN ACT relating to establishing ALS Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 45) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2016-03-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-07 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-03-04 | House | received in House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-23 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB211.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB211/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB211/vote_history.pdf |