KY SB211 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 27A to require the Administrative Office of the Courts to report information relating to defendants convicted of offenses in KRS Chapter 218A relating to controlled substances and thefts of anhydrous ammonia in KRS Chapter 514 and other specified violations to the Office of Drug Control Policy; create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to require the Office of Drug Control Policy to institute a Precursor Block List as a part of the Kentucky Electronic Methamphetamine Precursor Tracking system to prohibit persons convicted of offenses stated above from purchasing ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, and phenylpropanolamine for not less than five years following conviction; amend KRS 218A.1437 relating to possession of methamphetamine precursors to reduce amount that may be possessed from 9 grams to 7 1/2 grams; amend KRS 218A.1438 to add an affirmative defense and make a technical correction; reduce amount of methamphetamine precursors that may be purchased from 9 grams to 7 1/2 grams; amend KRS 218A.1446 relating to the purchase of ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, and phenylpropanolamine to block persons convicted of those offenses from purchasing or possessing these substances except by prescription and make these substances prescription drugs only for these persons; create a new section of KRS Chapter 439 to require the Parole Board to order the parolee to participate in the Precursor Block List and to refrain from purchasing methamphetamine precursors for five years after release from parole; create a new section of KRS Chapter 533 to place a defendant on probation, home incarceration, or conditional discharge on the Precursor Block List for five years; effective September 1, 2010.
Title
AN ACT relating to controlled substances, including controlled substance precursors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-29 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-25 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-25 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-24 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-23 | posting waived | |
2010-03-19 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-03-18 | received in House | |
2010-03-17 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-03-16 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 17, 2010 | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2010-03-12 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-12 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-11 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-11 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-11 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-08 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-03-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB211.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB211/bill.doc |