KY SB21 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 65)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 65)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 217 to define terms; permit eligible patients to use investigational drugs, biological products, or devices for a terminal illness; establish the conditions for use of such experimental treatments; prohibit sanctions of health care providers; clarify the duties of health care insurers regarding experimental treatments; prohibit certain actions by state officials.
Title
AN ACT relating to use of experimental treatments for terminal illnesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 65) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-7 |
2017-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-27 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | received in House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-01-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |