KY SB209 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.925 to change the date that local governments have to report the uniform financial information report to the Governor's Office for Local Development and the Legislative Research Commission from September 30, 1992, to October 30, 2010.
Title
AN ACT relating to local government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-08 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-08 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-05 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-05 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2010-03-05 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-05 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB209.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB209/bill.doc |