KY SB202 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes relating to the Franklin Circuit Court to modify standards for venue and jurisdiction in actions and give concurrent jurisdiction to other Circuit Courts in the Commonwealth.
Title
AN ACT relating to venue in civil actions that include the Commonwealth or its agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-03-17 | House | received in House |
2016-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB202.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB202/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB202/vote_history.pdf |