KY SB202 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 439.340 to allow the Parole Board to order participation in a specific violence reduction program as a condition of parole; amend KRS 533.030 to allow a court to require participation in a specific violence reduction program as a condition of probation or conditional discharge.
Title
AN ACT relating to conditions of supervision.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Neal [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2974 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | received in House |
2024-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Bail and Pretrial Release
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Probation and Parole
Public Protection
Public Safety
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Probation and Parole
Public Protection
Public Safety