KY SB20 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section in KRS Chapter 2 designating October as Anti-Bullying Month in Kentucky and a purple and yellow ribbon as the symbol for anti-bullying awareness.
Title
AN ACT related to anti-bullying.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 63) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2014-03-25 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-06 | House | to State Government (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | received in House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2014 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB20.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB20/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB20/vote_history.pdf |