KY SB191 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 99)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 99)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 309.080 to add definitions of certified alcohol and drug counselor assistant I and II; create new sections of KRS 309.080 to 309.089 to establish requirements for certification of alcohol and drug couselor assistant I and II; amend KRS 309.083 to change required hours of experience for certified alcohol and drug counselors to 600 hours under supervision; permit registration as an alcohol and drug peer support specialist to substitute for required classroom hours; amend KRS 309.831 to reduce required hours of experience and education, and reduce required time in recovery from two to one year; amend KRS 309.805, 309.8013, and 309.088 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1446 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 356 (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 267 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1302 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1297 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 356 (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 267 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1302 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1297 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 99) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-14 | Senate | bill passed 33-0 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2020-04-14 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | bill passed 86-4 |
2020-04-14 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2020-04-14 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2020-04-14 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2020-03-26 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2020-03-26 | House | House refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-26 | House | posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-03-26 | House | received in House |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-19 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-18 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | received in House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Alcoholism
Boards and Commissions
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Mental Health
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Boards and Commissions
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Mental Health
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Substance Abuse