KY SB189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 406 to allow the court to consider the financial resources of both parties in paternity actions and order a party to pay a reasonable portion of the other party's attorney's fees and costs.
Title
AN ACT relating to attorney's fees for paternity actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1406 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 29-1 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |