KY SB188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to define terms for pharmacy-related insurance practices; require insurers, pharmacy benefit managers, and other pharmacy benefits administrators to establish reasonably adequate and accessible pharmacy networks; require the filing of an annual report; require the insurance commissioner to review pharmacy networks; provide that information and data acquired by the Department of Insurance shall be considered proprietary and not subject to disclosure under KRS 61.870 to 61.884 relating to open records; establish requirements for certain contracts between a pharmacy or pharmacist and an insurer, a pharmacy benefit manager, or any other pharmacy benefits administrator; establish prohibited conduct and requirements for certain pharmacy-related insurance practices; establish a complaint process for insureds, pharmacies, and pharmacists impacted by a violation of certain pharmacy-related insurance laws; create a new section of Subtitle 99 of KRS Chapter 304 to authorize the insurance commissioner to order reimbursement to persons who incurred a monetary loss as a result of a violation of certain pharmacy-related insurance laws; amend KRS 304.9-053 to require certain filings; amend KRS 304.9-054 to establish requirements for pharmacy benefit manager licensure; amend KRS 304.9-055 to permit the insurance commissioner to promulgate administrative regulations relating to pharmacy benefit managers; amend KRS 304.14-120 to require the insurance commissioner to review certain health plans; amend KRS 304.17A-712 to conform; amend KRS 304.17C-125 to apply certain pharmacy-related insurance laws to limited health service benefit plans, including limited health service contracts; amend KRS 304.38A-115 to apply certain pharmacy-related insurance laws to limited health service organizations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 18A to require the state employee health plan and state agencies to comply with certain pharmacy-related insurance laws; amend KRS 367.828 to establish certain requirements for health discount plans relating to prescription drugs; make technical corrections; repeal KRS 304.38A-120, relating to assignment of certain benefits under limited health service organization plans, to consolidate provisions; apply various sections to contracts issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2025; require the insurance commissioner to promulgate administrative regulations to implement this Act on or before January 1, 2025; EFFECTIVE, in part, January 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to patient access to pharmacy benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 400 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 3046 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 3046 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2024-03-28 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-27 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-26 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | received in House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2024-03-11 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-06 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Consumer Affairs
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Pharmacists
Reports Mandated
State Employees
Technical Corrections
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Consumer Affairs
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Pharmacists
Reports Mandated
State Employees
Technical Corrections