KY SB179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 151 to establish definitions for KRS 151.700 to 151.730, regarding the Kentucky River Authority; amend KRS 151.710 to clarify membership requirements for directors of the Kentucky River Authority.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky River Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1653 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-30 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-15 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2021-03-15 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Boats and Boating
Public Authorities
Transportation
Water Supply
Waterways and Dams
Boats and Boating
Public Authorities
Transportation
Water Supply
Waterways and Dams