KY SB176 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.035 to require the Finance and Administration Cabinet to adopt regulations governing use of reverse auctions; amend KRS 45A.070 to define "reverse auction"; amend KRS 45A.080, 45A.085, 45A.100, and 45A.180 to allow the use of reverse auctions in various procurement methods; amend KRS 45A.345 to define "reverse auction"; amend KRS 45A.365, and 45A.370 to allow the use of reverse auction in various procurement methods; amend KRS 45A.690 to define "reverse auction; amend KRS 45A.695 to allow the use of reverse auction in soliciting personal service contracts and memoranda of agreement; amend KRS 56.440 to define "reverse auction"; amend KRS 56.803 to allow use of reverse auctions in procuring government leases; amend KRS 65.025 to define "reverse auction" and allow local governments to use reverse auctions in procurement procedures; amend KRS 160.290 to allow the use of reverse auctions in local boards of education procurement procedures; amend KRS 162.070 to allow local boards of education to use reverse auctions in procuring construction contracts; amend KRS 164A.575 to allow the governing boards of higher education institutions to use reverse auctions in their procurement procedures; amend KRS 164A.585 to allow governing boards of higher education institutions to use reverse auctions in procuring construction contracts; amend KRS 176.080 to allow the Department of Highways to use reverse auctions in its procurement procedures; amend KRS 178.140 to allow fiscal courts to use reverse auctions in their procurement procedures; amend KRS 180.060 to allow the Department of Highways to use reverse auctions in its procurement procedures for bridge construction; amend KRS 220.290 to allow sanitation district boards to use reverse auctions in their procurement procedures; and amend KRS 267.240 and 268.520 to allow county boards of drainage commissioners to use reverse auctions in their procurement procedures.
Title
AN ACT relating to reverse auctions in government purchasing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63) | |
2010-03-25 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-25 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-24 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-03-23 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-03-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-18 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-17 | posting waived | |
2010-03-15 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-03-12 | received in House | |
2010-03-11 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-10 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-04 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-03 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-01 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-24 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB176.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB176/bill.doc |