KY SB174 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.21)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.21)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 367.4903 to add definitions for “communications network,” “communications service provider,” and “communications terminal”; amends KRS 367.4909 to require that if damage is done to an underground gas or hazardous liquid facility and no attempt to locate the underground facility was made, the operator shall include in its report to the Public Service Commission the distance from the communications terminal that the damage occurred, and to require that the Public Service Commission submit a report to the Legislative Research Commission on or before December 1, 2025, detailing the number of damage reports from communications service providers that occurred in the area where they are allowed to use nonintrusive excavation; and amends KRS 367.4915 to exempt from the underground facility damage prevention requirements nonintrusive excavating of a depth not greater than 12 inches and within 12 inches of a communication service provider’s own communications network.
Title
AN ACT relating to underground facility damage prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 337 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2940 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2940 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch.21) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2024-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | received in House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-02-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-02-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-02-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-07 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Communications
Information Technology
Public Protection
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Telecommunications
Information Technology
Public Protection
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Telecommunications