KY SB172 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 367.4911 to include exempted activities in the process of ceasing operations when damage occurs to an underground facility and notification of appropriate authorities; amend KRS 367.4915 to make conforming changes.
Title
AN ACT relating to underground facility protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1765 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 326 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1609 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 326 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1609 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 105) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 35-0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-05 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | received in House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Communications
Energy
Hazardous Materials
Local Mandate
Oil and Natural Gas
Public Protection
Public Safety
Public Utilities
Public Works
Safety
Sewer Systems
Telecommunications
Waste Management
Water Supply
Energy
Hazardous Materials
Local Mandate
Oil and Natural Gas
Public Protection
Public Safety
Public Utilities
Public Works
Safety
Sewer Systems
Telecommunications
Waste Management
Water Supply