KY SB171 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 152)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promulgate regulations regarding splash pads that are operated by local governments; amend KRS 337.285 and 95.495 to allow peace officers in cities of the home rule class to be scheduled for 80 hours or less in a work period of 14 consecutive days under specified conditions; amend KRS 309.364 to direct that the relevant provisions of KRS Chapter 309 supersede specified local government regulations on massage therapists; amend KRS 66.480 relating to the investment of moneys subject to various governing jurisdictions to exclude from the investment maximum of 40% mutual funds consisting of specified investments; amend KRS 58.150, relating to the issuance of bonds, to remove the exception that notes of amounts of less than $1 million are not advertised pursuant to KRS 424.360 and provide that in such a case the publications required under the section are sufficient.
Title
AN ACT relating to local government and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 414 (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 413 (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1802 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1680 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 225 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1593 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 413 (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1802 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1680 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 225 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1593 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 152) |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 81-11 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 36-1 |
2021-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto for Monday, March 29, 2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Bill passed 34-0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) for Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | received in House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-11 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Banks and Financial Institutions
Bonds, Public
Cities
Cities, Home Rule Class
Collective Bargaining
Financial Responsibility
Licensing
Local Government
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Parks and Shrines
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Health
Securities
Workforce
Banks and Financial Institutions
Bonds, Public
Cities
Cities, Home Rule Class
Collective Bargaining
Financial Responsibility
Licensing
Local Government
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Parks and Shrines
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Health
Securities
Workforce