KY SB159 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Designate Ale-8-One as the official Kentucky original soft drink.
Title
AN ACT designating Ale-8-One as the official Kentucky original soft drink.
Sponsors
Sen. R.J. Palmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-19 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB159.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB159/bill.doc |