KY SB145 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.070 to remove the statutory eligibility restriction for nonresident student participation in interscholastic athletics; retain eligibility authority with the agency designated to manage interscholastic athletics.
Title
AN ACT relating to interscholastic athletics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2706 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 306 (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2568 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 306 (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2568 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | passed 37-0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 80-17 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-16 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | received in House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35 -0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |