KY SB140 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 341.413 to remove the waiver application deadline for unemployment insurance overpayment of thirty days on unemployment insurance claims filed between January 27, 2020, and December 31, 2020; provide that the waiver application deadline shall be one year from the overpayment notice; provide that the claimant may request a new hearing in Circuit Court.
Title
AN ACT relating to unemployment insurance benefits and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3068 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 326 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2928 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 326 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2928 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-06 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2024-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-23 | House | received in House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | introduced in Senate |