KY SB140 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.186 to clarify notice requirements, change duty to report to the commissioner of education, and require certification of compliance.
Title
AN ACT relating to notifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 412 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 482 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 482 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 66) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | received in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB140.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB140/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB140/vote_history.pdf |