KY SB14 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - floor amendment (1) filed and floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 218A.1412 to require that persons who traffic in heroin or fentanyl be charged as Class C felons for the first offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to trafficking in heroin.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29Housefloor amendment (1) filed and floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
2017-03-02House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-03-01Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2017-02-27Houseposted in committee
2017-02-15Houseto Judiciary (H)
2017-02-14Housereceived in House
2017-02-14Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute
2017-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2017
2017-02-14Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2017-02-10Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2017-02-10Senatetaken from Rules (S)
2017-02-09Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2017-01-07Senateto Judiciary (S)
2017-01-07Senatetaken from Rules (S)
2017-01-04Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-04Senate2nd reading
2017-01-04Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senate1st reading
2017-01-03Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB14.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB14/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB14/SCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB14/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB14/HCA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB14/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB14/HFA2.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB14/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB14/LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB14/SCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB14/CI.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB14/SCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB14/HCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB14/HCS1CI.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback