KY SB14 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 525.125 to include the owning, possessing, keeping, breeding, training, selling, or transferring of dogs for fighting purposes within the offense of cruelty to animals in the first degree.
Title
AN ACT relating to animal fighting.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] | Sen. Reginald Thomas [D] |
Sen. George Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-02-29 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-02-26 | House | received in House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, Fefruary 25, 2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |