KY SB136 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.2844 to require any active member of the Kentucky National Guard to be treated as a Kentucky resident for tuition purposes when enrolling in a Kentucky public postsecondary institution.
Title
AN ACT relating to in-state tuition for Kentucky National Guard members.
Sponsors
Sen. Jared Carpenter [R] | Sen. Tom Buford [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] |
Sen. Stan Humphries [R] | Sen. Brandon Smith [R] | Sen. George Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 128) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2017-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2017-03-07 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st reading |
2017-03-07 | House | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | received in House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |