KY SB128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as consent bill
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 194A.700 to 194A.729 to prohibit certification or certification renewal of an assisted-living community if it is owned, managed, or operated by any person convicted of certain crimes or listed on an abuse list; exempt owner of an assisted-living facility certified as of July 1, 2019; amend KRS 194A.700 to amend definitions; amend KRS 194A.707 (Effective July 1, 2019) to make changes to the appeals and renewal processes; amend KRS 194A.717 to prohibit on-site staff person from being shared with another level of care; amend KRS 194A.723 to permit the cabinet to initiate injunctive relief in Circuit Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to assisted-living communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1 RSN# 895 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as consent bill
2019-03-13Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2019-03-13House1st reading
2019-03-13Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2019-03-05Houseposted in committee
2019-03-04Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-03-01Housereceived in House
2019-03-01Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-03-01Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-28Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-07Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback