KY SB120 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 8)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 8)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 230.210 to define "licensed premises," "pari-mutuel wagering," and to amend the definition of "track"; amend KRS 230.361 to restrict wagering at simulcast facilities to pari-mutuel wagering on simulcasting; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to pari-mutuel wagering and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Jason Howell [R] |
Sen. Dennis Parrett [D] | Sen. Robert Stivers [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Reginald Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 75 (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 74 (Y: 36 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1537 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt sfa 1 RSN# 1536 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 74 (Y: 36 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1537 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt sfa 1 RSN# 1536 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 8) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-02-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | passed 55-38 |
2021-02-11 | House | floor amendments (1) and (6) ruled out of order |
2021-02-11 | House | floor amendment (5) defeated |
2021-02-11 | House | 3rd reading |
2021-02-11 | House | floor amendment (2) withdrawn |
2021-02-11 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-02-11 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5) and (6) filed |
2021-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-09 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | 1st reading |
2021-02-09 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | received in House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | passed 22-15 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | floor amendments (2-title) and (3) withdrawn |
2021-02-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-02-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) filed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-03 | Senate | returned to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | taken from Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Amusements and Recreation
Boards and Commissions
Effective Dates, Emergency
Gambling
Horses and Horse Racing
Licensing
Racing
Wagering
Boards and Commissions
Effective Dates, Emergency
Gambling
Horses and Horse Racing
Licensing
Racing
Wagering