KY SB116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 39 of KRS Chapter 304 to require the use of a peer review committee or a licensed chiropractor when performing a utilization review.
Title
AN ACT relating to chiropractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB116.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB116/bill.doc |